OR HJR203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution establishing obligation of state to ensure every resident of state access to cost-effective, medically appropriate and affordable health care. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution establishing obligation of state to ensure every resident of state access to effective] cost-effective, medically appropriate and affordable health care. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to obligation of state to ensure access to health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-13 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2018-02-13 | House | Read. Carried by Greenlick. Adopted. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson. |
2018-02-09 | House | Subsequent referral to Rules rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2018-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Rules be rescinded. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |