OR HJR202 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution establishing obligation of state to ensure every resident of state access to cost-effective, clinically appropriate and affordable health care. Requires state to balance obligation to ensure health care with funding of public schools and other essential public services. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to obligation of state to ensure access to health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Special Order (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Be adopted and rescind subsequent referral to Rules (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2020-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-18SenateReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-17HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Nosse, Salinas. Adopted. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Doherty, Drazan, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Clem, Post, Wallan.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 17, 2020 Calendar.
2020-02-14HouseSubsequent referral to Rules rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2020-02-14HouseRecommendation: Be adopted and subsequent referral to Rules be rescinded.
2020-02-11HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Rules.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback