OR HJR17 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to allow indebtedness to finance multifamily housing for households with income less than or equal to 80 percent of median income in metropolitan statistical area in which housing will be developed. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to bonded indebtedness.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HJR17 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HJR17/Introduced |