OR HJM201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to direct Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration to enhance safety standards for new and existing tank rail cars used to transport crude oil and other flammable liquids. Urges Congress to direct Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration to enhance safety standards for new and existing tank rail cars used to transport crude oil and other flammable liquids.
Title
Urging Congress to enhance safety standards for new and existing tank rail cars used to transport crude oil and other flammable liquids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Be adopted as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Be adopted as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. memorial. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-13 | House | Read. Carried by Smith Warner. Adopted.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |