OR HJM20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to enact legislation requiring Federal Aviation Administration to expedite approval process for unmanned aircraft testing in rural areas.
Title
Urging Congress to enact legislation requiring Federal Aviation Administration to expedite approval process for unmanned aircraft testing in rural areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-06-09 | President signed. | |
2011-06-08 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-31 | Final reading. Carried by Atkinson. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-05-27 | Carried over to 05-31 by unanimous consent. | |
2011-05-26 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-26 | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. | |
2011-05-23 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-04-28 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-27 | Read. Carried by Conger. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Brewer. | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-25 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-21 | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-01 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |