OR HJM2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges United States Secretary of Interior to allow enhanced management of cormorants by State of Oregon.
Title
Urging United States Secretary of Interior to allow enhanced management of cormorants by State of Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-02 | House | Read. Carried by Krieger. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Davis, Lively, Read, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-04-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |