OR HCR4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Specialist Nickolaus Gregory Gossack (1987-2010) for his service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Specialist Nickolaus Gregory Gossack for his service to his country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Special Order (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2019-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2019-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Girod. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--President Courtney, Thomsen.
2019-03-07SenateMade a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent.
2019-03-07SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-07SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-06SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-02-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-02-14HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Lewis. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nathanson.
2019-02-14HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 14, 2019 Calendar.
2019-02-13HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback