OR HCR36 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Chief Steve Bartol for his service to Milwaukie Police Department and State of Oregon.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Chief Steve Bartol for his service to Milwaukie Police Department and State of Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Special Order (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Special Order (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Taylor. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Power. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-04-29 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |