OR HCR29 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Sergeant First Class Richard Joseph Henkes II (1973-2006) for his service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Sergeant First Class Richard Joseph Henkes II for his service to his country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Special Order (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2019-05-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-21SenateFinal reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-20SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-20SenateRecommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution.
2019-05-15SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-05-08SenatePossible Work Session cancelled.
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-04-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-11HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Meek. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Barreto, Noble, Sprenger, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum.
2019-04-03HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 11, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-01HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback