OR HCR29 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates South Salem High School Girls Varsity Basketball Team on their 2015 state championship.
Title
Congratulating South Salem High School Girls Varsity Basketball Team on their 2015 state championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Jodi Hack [R] | Sen. Jackie Winters [R] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Thomsen. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-01 | House | Read. Carried by Hack. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 1, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-05-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |