OR HCR29 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates July 3, 2013, as Senior Chief Petty Officer Tyrone Snowden Woods Day in State of Oregon.
Title
Designating July 3, 2013, as Senior Chief Petty Officer Tyrone Snowden Woods Day in the State of Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-03-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |