OR HCR23 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honors Ron Post for establishing Medical Teams International and improving lives of Oregonians and millions of others worldwide.
Title
Honoring Ron Post for establishing Medical Teams International.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Thomsen, President Courtney. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read. Carried by Nearman. Adopted.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Rayfield; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nosse. |
2015-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 7, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-04-17 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-04-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |