OR HCR22 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolves that in each biennium, Legislative Assembly shall appropriate from General Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs amount that is no less than amount appropriated from General Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs in biennium beginning July 1, 2015, as adjusted.
Title
Resolving that Legislative Assembly shall appropriate from General Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs amount that is no less than amount appropriated in biennium beginning July 1, 2015, as adjusted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HCR22 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HCR22/Introduced |