OR HCR22 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Corporal Robert "Bobby" Leon Jones (1983-2006) for his service to his country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Corporal Robert "Bobby" Leon Jones for his service to his country.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-17 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Olson, Meek. Adopted.Ayes, 60. |
2017-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |