OR HCR22 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memoriam: Allen Harry Boice, 1926-2010.
Title
In memoriam: Allen Harry Boice, 1926-2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-06-20 | President signed. | |
2011-06-17 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-13 | Final reading. Carried by Kruse. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-10 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-10 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-06-07 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-25 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-19 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-18 | Read. Carried by Krieger, Garrard. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hicks, Richardson. | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-08 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-04-06 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-03-16 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |