OR HCR211 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Former state Representative Paul Hanneman, 1936-2017.
Title
In memoriam: Former state Representative Paul Hanneman, 1936-2017.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Riley. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-13 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Gomberg. Adopted. Ayes, 60. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 13, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |