OR HCR208 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marks 75th anniversary of American Tree Farm System and commends those who developed it for farsighted stewardship of Oregon's forest resources.
Title
Marking the 75th anniversary of the American Tree Farm System.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Special Order (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Special Order (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Boquist, Johnson declared potential conflict of interest. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-09 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Krieger. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2016-02-05 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 9, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-03 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |