OR HCR206 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates Oregon State University on its 150th anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Oregon State University on its 150th anniversary.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Gelser. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-15 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Rayfield. Adopted. Ayes, 60. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 15, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |