OR HCR206 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memoriam: Officer Buddy Ray Herron, 1969-2011.
Title
In memoriam: Officer Buddy Ray Herron, 1969-2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Final reading. Carried by Nelson. Adopted. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Winters. | |
2012-02-25 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-25 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-24 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-23 | Read. Carried by Jenson. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-22 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |