OR HCR205 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memoriam: Representative Allen B. Pynn, 1936-2011.
Title
In memoriam: Representative Allen B. Pynn, 1936-2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2012-03-02 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-27 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-21 | Read. Carried by Kennemer. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-20 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 21, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-06 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |