OR HCR204 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates centennial of Oregon's ratification of Nineteenth Amendment to United States Constitution and honors those who led woman suffrage campaign in Oregon.
Title
Commemorating centennial of Oregon's ratification of Nineteenth Amendment to United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-17 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Moore-Green. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Clem, Greenlick, Post, Wallan. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 17, 2020 Calendar. |
2020-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |