OR HCR204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Deputy Gil Catalino Datan (1971-2015) for his service to this state.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Deputy Gil Catalino Datan for his service to this state.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Girod, Kruse, Winters. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-16 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Noble. Adopted. Ayes, 60. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 16, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |