OR HCR204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating victory by University of Oregon's football program in 2012 Rose Bowl.
Title
Commemorating victory by University of Oregon's football program in 2012 Rose Bowl.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2012-02-28 | President signed. | |
2012-02-28 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-24 | Final reading. Carried by Beyer. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-24 | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-08 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-07 | Read. Carried by Nathanson. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-03 | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-02 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |