OR HCR203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-24 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-24 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Hunt Memorial Park as home of Wasco County Fair since 1914.
Title
Recognizing Hunt Memorial Park as the home of the Wasco County Fair since 1914.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-05 | House | Read. Carried by Huffman. Adopted.Ayes, 60. |
2014-02-04 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |