OR HCR2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates 150th anniversary of Abraham Lincoln High School in Portland.
Title
Commemorating 150th anniversary of Abraham Lincoln High School in Portland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments to the A-Eng measure. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments to the A-Eng measure. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and readopted measure. Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Findley; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Speaker Kotek, Wilson. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Dembrow. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Winters. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments to the A-Eng. resolution. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-21 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Williamson. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barreto, Leif, McLane, Witt. |
2019-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 21, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 26, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-02-21 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 25, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 21, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-02-06 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-02-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |