OR HCR16 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memoriam: Col. Kenneth L. Reusser, USMC, 1920-2009.
Title
In memoriam: Col. Kenneth L. Reusser, USMC, 1920-2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-04-26 | President signed. | |
2011-04-26 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-04-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-04-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-30 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Veterans' and Military Affairs. | |
2011-03-17 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-03-16 | Read. Carried by Boone, Kennemer,. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-03-15 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 16, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-03-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 15, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-03-10 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-03-08 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Veterans Affairs. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |