OR HCR13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Veterans and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 8:00 am in HR B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Private First Class Ryan Jeffrey Hill (1986-2007) for his service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Private First Class Ryan Jeffrey Hill for his service to his country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Special Order (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenatePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-03-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-03-19HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Post. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Boles, Greenlick, McLane, Williams, Witt.
2019-03-11HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 19, 2019 Calendar.
2019-03-07HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-05HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-01-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback