OR HCR1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes impending overseas deployment of Oregon National Guard's 41st Infantry Brigade Combat Team. Honors service and sacrifice of Oregon's citizen soldiers and their families and expresses support for them.
Title
Recognizing and supporting Oregon National Guard's 41st Infantry Brigade Combat Team and family members.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-04 | House | Read. Carried by Meek, Lewis. Adopted. Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Gorsek, McKeown, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Power, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |