OR HCR1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates certain cities as "Medal of Honor" communities or cities.
Title
Designating certain cities as "Medal of Honor" communities or cities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huffman [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
Rep. Mike McLane [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and readopted measure.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Greenlick, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Knopp. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Carried over to 05-11 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-02 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Huffman. Adopted.Ayes, 60. |
2017-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-22 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-02-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |