OR HB5202 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies amounts and purposes authorized for issuance of general obligation bonds and revenue bonds for biennium. Authorizes issuance of various lottery bonds. Modifies description of project] projects for which lottery bonds may be issued. Requires public universities to impose certain requirements relating to apprenticeship, benefits and outreach to women, minority individuals and veterans on contractors for certain projects. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |