OR HB5201 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 99, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocations during biennium. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for biennial expenses. Increases and decreases certain biennial appropriations made from General Fund to specified state agencies and Emergency Board. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by specified state agencies. Limits biennial expenditures of specified state agencies from federal funds, lottery moneys and bond proceeds. Increases and decreases limitations on expenditures for certain biennial expenses of specified state agencies. Provides that certain expenditures of specified state agencies are not limited. Increases allocations to various state agencies of moneys deposited into Watershed Conservation Operating Fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 99, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
2018-04-10HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2018-03-03SenateHass declared potential conflict of interest.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-03-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-03HousePotential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G.
2018-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Nearman, Parrish, Reschke; Excused, 1--Hayden.
2018-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-03-02HouseWork Session held.
2018-03-02HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-03-02HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-20HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2018-02-12HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-02-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback