OR HB5050 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 644, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 644, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocations during biennium. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for biennial expenses. Modifies certain biennial appropriations made from General Fund to specified state agencies. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by specified state agencies. Limits biennial expenditures of specified state agencies from federal funds and lottery moneys. Modifies limitations on expenditures for certain biennial expenses for specified state agencies. Modifies certain biennial appropriations to specified state agencies for biennium ending June 30, 2019. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019] on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 644, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor signed with line-item veto. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Golden. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-30 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Keny-Guyer, Sanchez. |
2019-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 4--Helm, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan. |
2019-06-30 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hayden, Smith G. |
2019-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |