OR HB5047 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 817, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increases limitation on expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, other moneys and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by Oregon Health Authority. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Increases limitation on expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by Department of Human Services. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by Department of Revenue for core system replacement project. Increases limitation on expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by Department of Revenue for purpose of implementing House Bill 2041 (2015). Increases limitation on expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by State Department of Agriculture. Limits biennial expenditures by Oregon Liquor Control Commission from Oregon Liquor Control Commission Account and Marijuana Control and Regulation Fund. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 817, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Olsen, Thomsen.
2015-07-06SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2015-07-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-07-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 9--Barreto, Davis, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Johnson, Parrish, Weidner.
2015-07-03HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2015-07-01HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-07-01HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-06-24HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback