OR HB5042 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chapter 4, (2021 Laws): Effective date April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies certain appropriations from General Fund to specified state agencies and Emergency Board for biennium ending June 30, 2021. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Modifies certain appropriations from General Fund to specified state agencies and Emergency Board for biennium ending June 30, 2021. Modifies certain limitations on expenditures for specified state agencies for biennium ending June 30, 2021. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for specified purposes for biennium ending June 30, 2021. Limits biennial expenditures of specified agencies from specified moneys for biennium ending June 30, 2021. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021] on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseChapter 4, (2021 Laws): Effective date April 15, 2021.
2021-04-15HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-08SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Burdick, Thatcher.
2021-04-07SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-04-05SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-04-05SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Lively, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-17HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-03-17HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-03-11HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback