OR HB5039 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 816, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to transfer certain amounts from Tobacco Settlement Funds Account for certain purposes. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Tobacco Settlement Funds Account; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 816, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-02SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2015-07-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Boquist, Thatcher; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-02SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2015-07-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2015-07-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-30HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Barreto, Esquivel, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Weidner; Absent, 1--Whitsett; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Greenlick.
2015-06-30HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-26HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-01-29HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback