OR HB5033 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 582, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 582, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Public Defense Services Commission for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by commission. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Public Defense Services Commission; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 582, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Boquist. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-30 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Bynum, Lininger. |
2017-06-30 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Lininger. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 46; Nays, 7--Barnhart, Bynum, Clem, Greenlick, Helm, Keny-Guyer, Marsh; Excused, 2--Boone, Williamson; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Hernandez, Holvey, Lively, Smith Warner, Whisnant. |
2017-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |