OR HB5030 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 668, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 668, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Health Authority for certain biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Health Authority; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 668, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates,Winters. Passed. Ayes, 18; nays, 10--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Boquist, Close. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-02 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 24--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-02 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |