OR HB5030 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Chapter 621, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Chapter 621, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Human Services; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Human Services; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | Chapter 621, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2011. | |
2011-07-06 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Atkinson, Boquist, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett. | |
2011-06-29 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-29 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-28 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-28 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-28 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Dembrow, Doherty. | |
2011-06-28 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hicks. | |
2011-06-28 | Third reading. Carried by Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Bailey, Brewer, Cannon, Conger, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Esquivel, Greenlick, Johnson, Krieger, Lindsay, Matthews, Nolan, Parrish, Sheehan, Smith J., Wand, Weidner; Excused, 1--Clem. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 28, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-23 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 27, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-22 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-17 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 20, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-16 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 17, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-01 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-29 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-24 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-22 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-22 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-21 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-01 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-04 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. | |
2011-02-04 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |