OR HB5029 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 670, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Maintains and reserves lottery revenues available to benefit public purposes during biennium beginning July 1, 2019, in Administrative Services Economic Development Fund. Allocates moneys from fund for biennium beginning July 1, 2019. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to establish process for quarterly allocations of moneys from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund and Veterans' Services Fund. Transfers certain interest earnings from Oregon Education Fund to Lottery Bond Fund for payments by Department of Education on education lottery bonds. Allocates moneys from Veterans' Services Fund for biennium beginning July 1, 2019. Directs distribution of moneys from Criminal Fine Account. Directs distribution of moneys from Oregon Marijuana Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14HouseChapter 670, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
2019-08-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-07-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-30SenateGelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2019-06-30SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum.
2019-06-30SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-26HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith G.
2019-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Hernandez, Reardon.
2019-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-06-25HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-25HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-25HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
2019-01-23HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback