OR HB5026 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Chapter 539, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Chapter 539, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Health Licensing Agency; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Health Licensing Agency; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Chapter 539, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011. | |
2011-06-28 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-21 | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-16 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-15 | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 13--Brewer, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Johnson, Krieger, Lindsay, Parrish, Sheehan, Thatcher, Wand, Weidner, Wingard. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 15, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-13 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-10 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-09 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-07 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-26 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-05-26 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-21 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-04 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. | |
2011-02-04 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |