OR HB5022 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 299, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 299, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Marine Board. Limits biennial expenditures by board from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Marine Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Chapter 299, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017. |
2017-06-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Olsen. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 05-31 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 3--Boone, Clem, McKeown. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |