OR HB5011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 556, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 556, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Housing and Community Services Department for biennial expenses and for debt service. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Housing and Community Services Department for biennial expenses and for debt service. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain lottery moneys. Limits biennial expenditures by department from other federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Appropriates moneys to from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocation to department during biennium. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Housing and Community Services Department; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 556, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Burdick, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Post, Reschke, Wallan. |
2021-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |