OR HB5008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 166, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 166, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Employment Relations Board for biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Employment Relations Board for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by board. Limits biennial expenditures by board from moneys received from assessment against state agencies. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Employment Relations Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 166, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 5--Breese-Iverson, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 5--Clem, Hayden, Lively, Nearman, Stark. |
2021-05-12 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |