OR HB5008 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 723, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 723, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocations during biennium.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 723, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed with line-item veto. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Ferrioli, George, Kruse; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-08 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Richardson, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2013-07-08 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-07 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |