OR HB5006 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 702, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocations during biennium. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for biennial expenses. Increases and decreases certain biennial appropriations made from General Fund to specified state agencies. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by specified state agencies. Limits biennial expenditures of specified state agencies from federal funds and lottery moneys. Increases and decreases limitations on expenditures for certain biennial expenses for specified state agencies. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HouseChapter 702, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
2017-08-15HouseGovernor signed with line-item veto.
2017-07-18SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher.
2017-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2017-07-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-07-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-07-05HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Barreto, Buehler, Hayden, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Boone.
2017-07-05HouseSecond reading.
2017-07-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2017-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2017-07-03HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-07-03HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2017-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB5006
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5006/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5006/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5006/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5006/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23454
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365077
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365168
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26710
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421485
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421896

Bill Comments

feedback