OR HB4177 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 77, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 77, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to county assessment function funding assistance payments; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to county assessment function funding assistance payments; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 77, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-21 | President signed. | |
2012-03-21 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Verger. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-03-05 | Second reading. | |
2012-03-05 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-03-02 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-03-02 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-03-02 | Second reading. | |
2012-03-02 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2012-03-02 | Work Session held. | |
2012-03-01 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-03-01 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-17 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |