OR HB4173 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 102, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 102, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the printing of official election ballots; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the printing of official election ballots; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Chapter 102, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-02 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Atkinson. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-23 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-15 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |