OR HB4172 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Chapter 50, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Chapter 50, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of retired state police officers to enforce laws concerning tobacco products; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the use of retired state police officers to enforce laws concerning tobacco products; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Chapter 50, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-05 | President signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2012-02-29 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-28 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-28 | Third reading. Carried by Tomei, Olson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gelser. | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-23 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-21 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-16 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-13 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |