OR HB4169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 81, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 81, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to offenses; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to offenses; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 81, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-02 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Atkinson, Boquist, Kruse, Morse, Olsen. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-25 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-25 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-24 | Third reading. Carried by Nolan. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Cameron, Speaker Hanna. | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-10 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-06 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |