OR HB4167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies statewide greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals. Establishes Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative and related provisions, operative January 1, 2022. Authorizes Public Utility Commission to allow rate or rate schedule to include differential rates or to reflect amounts for programs that enable public utilities to assist low-income residential customers. Amends greenhouse gas reporting statute. Repeals Energy Facility Siting Council carbon dioxide emissions standards. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule standards and requirements for reducing methane emissions from landfills. Repeals authority for State Forester to establish forestry carbon offset program. Provides that energy facility subject to site certificate or amended site certificate shall comply with Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative if energy facility would otherwise be subject to initiative. Abolishes Oregon Global Warming Commission, operative December 31, 2020. Modifies requirements for ethanol content in gasoline. Prohibits sale or offer for sale of general service lamps that do not meet certain efficiency standards. Authorizes State Department of Energy to modify prohibition by rule to align with laws of adjacent states. Provides for direct, expedited judicial review by Oregon Supreme Court of certain constitutional questions related to Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative. Requires certain reports and reviews related to Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative. Establishes, within Department of Environmental Quality, Oregon Greenhouse Gas Reduction Board, Administrator of the Office of Greenhouse Gas Regulation and Office of Greenhouse Gas Regulation and sets forth duties of board, administrator and office. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to greenhouse gas emissions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |